TN SB1982 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 222
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 222
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the time by which the Tennessee Duck River development agency must deliver a written report for alternative source analysis to certain members of the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 64, Chapter 1.
Title
As enacted, extends the time by which the Tennessee Duck River development agency must deliver a written report for alternative source analysis to certain members of the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 64, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Tracy [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-08 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-08 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-29 | Pub. Ch. 222 | |
2009-05-29 | Effective date(s) 05/18/09 | |
2009-05-18 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-05-08 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2009-05-07 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-05-06 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-05-06 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2009-05-04 | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0 | |
2009-05-04 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2009-04-16 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2009-04-13 | Passed S., Ayes 33, Nays 0 | |
2009-04-13 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (2) cal. for 04/13/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2009-04-07 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 04/08/2009 | |
2009-04-07 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/8/2009 | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 04/07/2009 | |
2009-03-31 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/7/2009 | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 03/31/2009 | |
2009-02-26 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2009-02-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-23 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1769 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 222