TN SB1978 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 924
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 924
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires, for any FastTrack grant or loan contract awarded after July 1, 2014, the department of economic and community development to publish all baseline reports or annual reports filed with the department on its web site within 90 days of receipt; requires that a one-time report be filed for certain FastTrack grants or loans awarded between May 27, 2005, and January 1, 2011. - Amends TCA Title 4.
Title
As enacted, requires, for any FastTrack grant or loan contract awarded after July 1, 2014, the department of economic and community development to publish all baseline reports or annual reports filed with the department on its web site within 90 days of receipt; requires that a one-time report be filed for certain FastTrack grants or loans awarded between May 27, 2005, and January 1, 2011. - Amends TCA Title 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Budget Sub Committee of F, W&M (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Budget Sub Committee of F, W&M (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-29 | Senate | Pub. Ch. 924 |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Effective date(s) 07/01/2014 |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Passed H., Ayes 90, Nays 1 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1028) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA0784) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0782) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Ref. to S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Recalled from S. F,W&M Comm. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/11/2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/11/2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/5/2014 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/5/2014 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/4/2014 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/4/2014 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/18/2014 |
2014-01-27 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1873 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 924