TN SB1978 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, grants state recognition to certain Indian tribes, bands, and groups; provides means for other Indian tribes, bands, and groups to receive state recognition. - Amends TCA Title 4.
Title
As introduced, grants state recognition to certain Indian tribes, bands, and groups; provides means for other Indian tribes, bands, and groups to receive state recognition. - Amends TCA Title 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-26 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2010-04-01 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 04/07/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/7/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 03/31/2010 | |
2010-03-18 | Ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2010-03-18 | Recalled from S. FW&M Comm. | |
2009-06-12 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. F,W&M Comm. | |
2009-06-12 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 6/12/2009 | |
2009-06-11 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/12/2009 | |
2009-06-11 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/11/2009 | |
2009-06-10 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/10/2009 | |
2009-06-09 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 6/10/2009 | |
2009-06-04 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/09/2009 | |
2009-05-28 | Ref. to S. F,W&M Comm. | |
2009-05-28 | Recalled from S. Cal. Comm. | |
2009-05-26 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to CAl. Comm Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 | |
2009-05-20 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 05/26/2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Action def. in St&L Gov't Comm. | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 05/12/2009 | |
2009-05-07 | R/S #83(8) to be heard in S. S&L Govt. Comm. on 05/12/2009 | |
2009-02-26 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2009-02-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-23 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1692 (Crossfiled) 2009-06-09 - Held on desk.