TN SB1972 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-31 - Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/7/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-31 - Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/7/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates alternative procedure for competitive bids for governmental utility board if board finds it is unlikely such procedure will encourage favoritism or substantially diminish competition for contracts. - Amends TCA Title 12, Chapter 3.
Title
As introduced, creates alternative procedure for competitive bids for governmental utility board if board finds it is unlikely such procedure will encourage favoritism or substantially diminish competition for contracts. - Amends TCA Title 12, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-31 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/7/2009 | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 03/31/2009 | |
2009-02-26 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2009-02-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-23 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2191 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-06 - Action Def. in s/c State Government of S&LG to 2010
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1972&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB1972.pdf |