TN SB1969 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes from March 15 to March 31 the date by which the Tennessee higher education commission must publish the Tennessee postsecondary education fact book each year. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, changes from March 15 to March 31 the date by which the Tennessee higher education commission must publish the Tennessee postsecondary education fact book each year. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1897 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-31 - Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee