TN SB1967 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Pub. Ch. 648
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, specifies that a marketplace contractor of a marketplace platform is not an employee of the marketplace platform. - Amends TCA Title 50; Title 56 and Title 62.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, specifies that a marketplace contractor of a marketplace platform is not an employee of the marketplace platform. - Amends TCA Title 50; Title 56 and Title 62.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 66 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-06 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11 Pub. Ch. 648
2018-04-11 Effective date(s) 07/01/2018
2018-04-09SenateSigned by Governor.
2018-04-02SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2018-03-29HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-03-28SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-03-27SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2018-03-26SenateConcurred, Ayes 26, Nays 3 (Amendment 1 - HA0843)
2018-03-23SenatePlaced on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 3/26/2018
2018-03-19HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 66, Nays 28, PNV 0
2018-03-19HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0843)
2018-03-19HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2018-02-15HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2018-02-12SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2018-02-12SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-12SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 25, Nays 3
2018-02-09SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/12/2018
2018-02-06SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-06SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2018-02-01SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2018-01-31SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/6/2018
2018-01-31SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-01-29SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1978 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 648

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback