TN SB1963 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires students who begin the ninth grade in a public or nonpublic high school in this state to attend public or nonpublic high school for four full school years unless the student is exempt from compulsory attendance, has successfully completed high school, or is enrolled and making satisfactory progress in a course leading to a GED® or HiSET®. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 6, relative to school attendance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2022 |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2015 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-16 - Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee