TN SB1952 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the Class C misdemeanor criminal offense of hazing. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17; Section 49-2-120 and Section 49-7-123.
Title
As introduced, creates the Class C misdemeanor criminal offense of hazing. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17; Section 49-2-120 and Section 49-7-123.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/3/2018 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1580 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-02 - Def. to Summer Study in Criminal Justice Committee