TN SB1951 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 353
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 353
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that, under law regarding records open to public inspection, "public record" or "state record" does not include the device or equipment that may have been used to create or store a public or state record. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5.
Title
As enacted, specifies that, under law regarding records open to public inspection, "public record" or "state record" does not include the device or equipment that may have been used to create or store a public or state record. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 1 BY Yager (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 1 BY Yager (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-03 | Pub. Ch. 353 | |
2011-06-03 | Effective date(s) 05/30/11 | |
2011-05-30 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-05-19 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2011-05-19 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-05-18 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-05-18 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2011-05-18 | Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 6, PNV 1 | |
2011-05-18 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0336) | |
2011-05-18 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2011-05-16 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2011-05-12 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2011-05-12 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0 | |
2011-05-12 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0494) | |
2011-05-10 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 5/12/2011 | |
2011-05-09 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2011-05-05 | R/S #83(8) to be heard in S. S&L Gov. Comm. on 5/9/2011 | |
2011-05-04 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 5/9/2011 | |
2011-05-03 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 5/10/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 5/3/2011 | |
2011-02-24 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2011-02-23 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1875 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 353