TN SB1929 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 19 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 19 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates an Amber+ Alert system for the purpose of issuing alerts with respect to certain youth who are reported missing under unexplained or suspicious circumstances, reported missing and at risk of harm, or reported missing and developmentally disabled or cognitively impaired. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 38, Chapter 6, Part 1, relative to missing persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 82 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-23 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-18 | House | Passed H., Ayes 82, Nays 8, PNV 0 |
2024-04-18 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0928) |
2024-04-18 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-04-11 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0879) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/9/2024 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/9/2024 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/8/2024 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/20/2024 |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2223 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-18 - Comp. SB subst.