TN SB1921 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Government Operations Committee
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Government Operations Committee
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the office of conservatorship management and registry. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 34 and Title 71, Chapter 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 34 and Title 71, Chapter 2, relative to conservatorships.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Government Operations Committee |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/21/2024 |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2516 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-06 - Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee