TN HB2516 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-06 - Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-06 - Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the office of conservatorship management and registry. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 34 and Title 71, Chapter 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 34 and Title 71, Chapter 2, relative to conservatorships.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee - Government Operations Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1921 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Government Operations Committee