TN SB1913 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-06 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. S&L Govt. Com.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-06 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. S&L Govt. Com.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires annual event tickets to include either the mailing address or telephone number of the 501(c)(3) organization in addition to the name of the 501(c)(3) organization. - Amends TCA Title 3.
Title
As introduced, requires annual event tickets to include either the mailing address or telephone number of the 501(c)(3) organization in addition to the name of the 501(c)(3) organization. - Amends TCA Title 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. S&L Govt. Com. | |
2011-02-24 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2011-02-23 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2067 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-21 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Calendar & Rules Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1913&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB1913.pdf |