TN SB1912 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C&L Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C&L Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, elevates prompt payment standards required of health insurance entities from 95 percent to 98 percent. - Amends TCA Title 56 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, elevates prompt payment standards required of health insurance entities from 95 percent to 98 percent. - Amends TCA Title 56 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Green [R] | Sen. Jon Lundberg [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C&L Comm. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1897 (Crossfiled) 2014-02-04 - Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1912&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB1912.pdf |