TN SB1912 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 130
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 130
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that TCA titles 50 and 56 provide the sole and exclusive statutory remedies and sanctions applicable to an insurer, person, or entity licensed, permitted, or authorized to do business under title 56 for alleged breach of, or for alleged unfair or deceptive acts or practices in connection with, a contract of insurance. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 8, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, specifies that TCA titles 50 and 56 provide the sole and exclusive statutory remedies and sanctions applicable to an insurer, person, or entity licensed, permitted, or authorized to do business under title 56 for alleged breach of, or for alleged unfair or deceptive acts or practices in connection with, a contract of insurance. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 8, Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-22 - Senate - S. C,L&A COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 130 | |
2011-04-11 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0116) | |
2011-04-04 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2011-04-01 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/4/2011 | |
2011-03-28 | S. Reset on cal. for 4/4/2011 | |
2011-03-24 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/28/2011 | |
2011-03-22 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2011-03-16 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 3/22/2011 | |
2011-02-24 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2011-02-23 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1189 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-10 - Pub. Ch. 130