TN SB1909 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-23 - Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-23 - Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows governmental entities to publish notices on their web sites in lieu of other methods of publication. - Amends TCA Title 1 and Title 8, Chapter 21.
Title
As introduced, allows governmental entities to publish notices on their web sites in lieu of other methods of publication. - Amends TCA Title 1 and Title 8, Chapter 21.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-23 | Senate | Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/23/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2247 (Crossfiled) 2016-01-27 - Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1909&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB1909.pdf |