TN SB1905 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, eliminates the sales tax on diapers and wipes. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Title
As introduced, eliminates the sales tax on diapers and wipes. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 2/18/2020 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Refer to Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2032 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020