TN SB1904 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/27/2022
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/27/2022
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes the date, from January 1 to January 15, by which the medical cannabis commission must submit its annual report to the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 38; Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 4; Title 39, Chapter 17; Title 43, Chapter 27; Title 53; Title 67 and Title 68, Chapter 7.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 33; Title 38; Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 4; Title 39, Chapter 17; Title 43, Chapter 27; Title 53; Title 67 and Title 68, Chapter 7, relative to cannabis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/19/2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2022 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1927 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/27/2022