TN SB1900 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the state to reimburse veterans with permanent and total disabilities for 100 percent of the local property taxes paid on their residences; removes the limitations that such reimbursement be a partial payment and that it be paid on the first $175,000 of the full market value of the residence. - Amends TCA Section 67-5-704.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 67-5-704, relative to property tax relief for veterans with disabilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1715 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-20 - Def. to Summer Study in Property & Planning Subcommittee