TN SB1887 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-28 - Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 5/5/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-28 - Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 5/5/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, decreases aggregate amount individual can contribute to candidates and all PACs to $25,000 every two years. - Amends TCA Section 2-10-312.
Title
As introduced, decreases aggregate amount individual can contribute to candidates and all PACs to $25,000 every two years. - Amends TCA Section 2-10-312.
Sponsors
Sen. James Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-28 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 5/5/2009 | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 04/28/2009 | |
2009-04-21 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/28/2009 | |
2009-04-20 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 04/21/2009 | |
2009-04-16 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 04/20/2009 | |
2009-04-14 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/14/2009 | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 04/14/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2126 (Crossfiled) 2009-03-04 - Assigned to s/c Elections of S&LG
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1887&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB1887.pdf |