TN SB1880 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Pub. Ch. 241
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Pub. Ch. 241
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, urges employers to develop programs under which their employees with children in school can take time off to volunteer in their children's schools. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, urges employers to develop programs under which their employees with children in school can take time off to volunteer in their children's schools. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Sen. James Kyle [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-25 | Pub. Ch. 241 | |
2011-05-25 | Effective date(s) 05/23/11 | |
2011-05-23 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-05-11 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2011-05-10 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-05-10 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-05-10 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2011-05-09 | Passed H., Ayes 98, Nays 0 | |
2011-05-09 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2011-03-24 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2011-03-21 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2011-03-21 | Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2011-03-17 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/21/2011 | |
2011-03-16 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2011-03-09 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/16/2011 | |
2011-02-24 | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. | |
2011-02-23 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2082 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 241