TN SB1878 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-25 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-25 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that the notification given by the court to a petitioning parent that the duty of future child support by the parent who is the subject of a termination petition will be forever terminated by entry of an order terminating parental rights must be in writing. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 33; Title 36; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 8; Title 33; Title 36; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to parental rights.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1942 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-30 - Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee