TN SB1878 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits taking custody of certain children transported across state lines without the written consent of the department of children's services. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 13; Title 34; Title 36; Title 37; Title 39; Title 49; Title 50; Title 55; Title 56; Title 66; Title 67; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 13; Title 34; Title 36; Title 37; Title 39; Title 49; Title 50; Title 55; Title 56; Title 66; Title 67; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/15/2022 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1919 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-16 - Failed in Civil Justice Committee