TN SB1876 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ negative recommendation
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ negative recommendation
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, exempts sales of caskets from sales and use tax. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Title
As introduced, exempts sales of caskets from sales and use tax. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ negative recommendation |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2305 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee