TN SB1867 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that a county and city may enter into an interlocal agreement for purposes of collecting and remitting business license fees. - Amends TCA Section 5-1-113.
Title
As introduced, clarifies that a county and city may enter into an interlocal agreement for purposes of collecting and remitting business license fees. - Amends TCA Section 5-1-113.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/27/2018 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2346 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee