TN SB1864 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 961
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 961
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the state board of education to promulgate rules for the development of a program whereby 501(c)(3) nonprofit corporations may be recognized for the purpose of assisting LEAs through the selection and appointment of qualified volunteers; requires LEAs to establish a local appeal process through which a recognized 501(c)(3) nonprofit corporation may appeal a decision of the LEA to reject the corporation's offer of assistance. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the state board of education to promulgate rules for the development of a program whereby 501(c)(3) nonprofit corporations may be recognized for the purpose of assisting LEAs through the selection and appointment of qualified volunteers; requires LEAs to establish a local appeal process through which a recognized 501(c)(3) nonprofit corporation may appeal a decision of the LEA to reject the corporation's offer of assistance. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Pub. Ch. 961 | |
2016-05-02 | Effective date(s) 04/27/2016; 01/01/2017 | |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2016-04-20 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2016-04-18 | House | Passed H., Ayes 71, Nays 17, PNV 2 |
2016-04-18 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA1209) |
2016-04-18 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0934) |
2016-04-18 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2016-03-31 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0881) |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/30/2016 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/23/2016 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/23/2016 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2489 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 961