TN SB1863 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the department of children's services from using penalties in determining the amounts payable in contracts or grants to providers for services related to the prevention, treatment, or care of delinquent juveniles. - Amends TCA Section 37-5-121.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 37-5-121, relative to performance-based contracting through the department of children's services for private providers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1989 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-30 - Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee