TN SB1861 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 816
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 816
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds to and revises various provisions of the Convention Center and Tourism Development Financing Act of 1998. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 57 and Title 67.
Title
As enacted, adds to and revises various provisions of the Convention Center and Tourism Development Financing Act of 1998. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 57 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 816 | |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/16/18 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Energy, Ag., & Nat. Resources Committee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/8/2018 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1923 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-04 - Pub. Ch. 816