TN SB1856 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 742
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 742
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes LEAs to adopt a salary schedule that is identical in either structure or designated salary levels or both to the salary schedule the LEA had in place during the 2012-2013 school year, with such schedule containing steps for each year of service up to and including 20 years and for the attainment of advanced degrees at the level of masters, masters plus 45 hours of graduate credit, specialist in education and doctor of education or doctor of philosophy; the schedule may not result in the reduction of the salary of a teacher employed by the LEA at the time of the adoption of the salary schedule. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 3 and Title 49, Chapter 5.
Title
As enacted, authorizes LEAs to adopt a salary schedule that is identical in either structure or designated salary levels or both to the salary schedule the LEA had in place during the 2012-2013 school year, with such schedule containing steps for each year of service up to and including 20 years and for the attainment of advanced degrees at the level of masters, masters plus 45 hours of graduate credit, specialist in education and doctor of education or doctor of philosophy; the schedule may not result in the reduction of the salary of a teacher employed by the LEA at the time of the adoption of the salary schedule. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 3 and Title 49, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | Pub. Ch. 742 |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Effective date(s) 04/21/2014 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Governor returned. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA1162) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1004) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 30, Nays 1 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA0987) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0847) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/7/2014 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/7/2014 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/3/2014 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/3/2014 |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/31/2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/19/2014 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/19/2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/12/2014 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1381 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 742