TN SB1855 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the first publication for a sale of land to foreclose a deed of trust, mortgage, or other lien securing the payment of money or other thing of value or under judicial orders or process to be at least 30 days, instead of at least 20 days, previous to the sale. - Amends TCA Title 35.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 35, relative to foreclosure notices.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Lowe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-22 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2136 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-12 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee