TN SB1854 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-29 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes person who registers to vote by mail to cast the person's first vote by absentee ballot. - Amends TCA Title 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, authorizes person who registers to vote by mail to cast the person's first vote by absentee ballot. - Amends TCA Title 2.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-29SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2020-01-27SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-01-24SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2746 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback