TN SB1845 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires each LEA to annually report to the department of education the number and types of task forces, programs, and initiatives established concerning harassment, intimidation, bullying, or cyber-bullying. - Amends TCA Section 37-1-403; Section 37-1-604 and Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 45.
Title
As introduced, requires each LEA to annually report to the department of education the number and types of task forces, programs, and initiatives established concerning harassment, intimidation, bullying, or cyber-bullying. - Amends TCA Section 37-1-403; Section 37-1-604 and Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 45.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2016 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/16/2016 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/9/2016 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/9/2016 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/2/2016 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2383 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-15 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1845&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB1845.pdf |