TN SB1844 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Effective date(s) 05/28/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Effective date(s) 05/28/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds certain locations as premiere type tourist resorts; makes revisions to law relative to urban park centers. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 57, relative to alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 3 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 2 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 3 BY HOLSCLAW PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 3 BY HOLSCLAW PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 73 N: 16 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 77 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 77 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 1 PNV 1 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 2 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 3 BY HOLSCLAW PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 3 BY HOLSCLAW PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 73 N: 16 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 77 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 77 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 1 PNV 1 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-31 | Effective date(s) 05/28/2024 | |
2024-05-31 | Pub. Ch. 1024 | |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-05-15 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 27, Nays 2, PNV 1 (Amendment 3 - HA1128) |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 27, Nays 2, PNV 1 (Amendment 2 - HA0837) |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 24, Nays 3, PNV 1 (Amendment 1 - HA0836) |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/25/2024 |
2024-04-24 | House | H. refused to recede from H am. no. 1, 2, 3 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Senate refused to concur in House amendment 3 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Senate refused to concur in House amendment 2 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Senate refused to concur in House amendment 1 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 for 4/24/2024 |
2024-04-23 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 77, Nays 15, PNV 3 |
2024-04-23 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA1128) |
2024-04-23 | House | Motion to reconsider adopted. |
2024-04-23 | House | Motion to lift from table adopted. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Senate returned to the House. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/23/2024 |
2024-04-22 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 77, Nays 14, PNV 4 |
2024-04-22 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0837) |
2024-04-22 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0836) |
2024-04-22 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-04-11 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 2, PNV 1 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0622) |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 3 - SA0989) |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0933) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/9/2024 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 1 PNV 1 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/5/2024 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1937 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-31 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1024