TN SB1831 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 782
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 782
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, standardizes period of time that agency must wait prior to adopting a rule without a public hearing. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 5.
Title
As enacted, standardizes period of time that agency must wait prior to adopting a rule without a public hearing. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 782 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Comp. HB subst. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 2/24/2014 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 2/19/2014 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1732 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 782