TN SB1820 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. H&W Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. H&W Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, revises the Intractable Pain Treatment Act to promote more appropriate use of controlled substances. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 53; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, revises the Intractable Pain Treatment Act to promote more appropriate use of controlled substances. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 53; Title 63 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. H&W Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. H&W Comm. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Placed on S. H&W Comm. cal. for 3/19/2014 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. H&W Comm. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/11/2014 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/11/2014 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/25/2014 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1966 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-29 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee