TN SB1816 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-24 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-24 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires notice of intent to enforce tax lien to be published in a newspaper of general circulation for three consecutive weeks instead of only two consecutive weeks. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.
Title
As introduced, requires notice of intent to enforce tax lien to be published in a newspaper of general circulation for three consecutive weeks instead of only two consecutive weeks. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1930 (Crossfiled) 2016-01-25 - Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1816&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB1816.pdf |