TN SB1813 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands the list of offenses for which there is no statute of limitations if the victim is an adult and notified law enforcement or the office of the district attorney general of the offense within three years. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39 and Title 40, relative to criminal offenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2022 |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1950 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-28 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee