TN SB1813 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the AOC to pay appointed counsel, other than public defenders or post-conviction defenders, within 30 days from the time a judicially approved claim is submitted in accordance with Supreme Court Rules, unless the claim is deemed to be extended or complex, in which case such claim shall be paid within 60 days. - Amends TCA Title 16 and Title 40, Chapter 14, Part 2.
Title
As introduced, requires the AOC to pay appointed counsel, other than public defenders or post-conviction defenders, within 30 days from the time a judicially approved claim is submitted in accordance with Supreme Court Rules, unless the claim is deemed to be extended or complex, in which case such claim shall be paid within 60 days. - Amends TCA Title 16 and Title 40, Chapter 14, Part 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2021 (Crossfiled) 2016-02-16 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1813&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB1813.pdf |