TN SB1809 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-24 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-24 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a volunteer rescue squad worker to respond to an emergency during the worker's regularly scheduled working hours without loss of pay, vacation time, sick leave, or earned overtime accumulation; authorizes such worker to take the worker's next shift off as a vacation or sick day without loss of pay under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Section 4-21-401; Section 50-1-307 and Section 50-1-309.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 4-21-401; Section 50-1-307 and Section 50-1-309, relative to rescue squad workers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1835 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-23 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee of Commerce Committee