TN SB1805 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department to utilize cost estimation models to determine the cost of day care when setting the annual day care reimbursement rate. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to child care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-13 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/9/2024 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/9/2024 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/28/2024 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 2/28/2024 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/21/2024 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 2/21/2024 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/14/2024 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1962 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-16 - Sponsor(s) Added.