TN SB1796 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Pub. Ch. 694
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Pub. Ch. 694
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Chris Newsom Act", which creates presumption to successor trial and appellate judges that if the original trial judge dismisses the jury following a unanimous verdict, that the judge exercised his or her duties as the 13th juror and approves the verdict. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 18, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Chris Newsom Act", which creates presumption to successor trial and appellate judges that if the original trial judge dismisses the jury following a unanimous verdict, that the judge exercised his or her duties as the 13th juror and approves the verdict. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 18, Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | House | Pub. Ch. 694 |
2014-04-22 | House | Effective date(s) 07/01/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2014-04-03 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-04-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-04-01 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-03-28 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-03-27 | House | Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0 |
2014-03-27 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Passed S., Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 2/20/2014 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/11/2014 |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 2/11/2014 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/4/2014 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1526 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 694