TN SB1787 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 429
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 429
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, subject to restrictions in federal law, prohibits the bureau of TennCare from disenrolling persons for fiscal or other reasons until the bureau has verified, at the time of application, the social security numbers of all enrollees and purged all persons ineligible due to issues of fraud or lack of lawful US residence. - Amends TCA Title 71.
Title
As enacted, subject to restrictions in federal law, prohibits the bureau of TennCare from disenrolling persons for fiscal or other reasons until the bureau has verified, at the time of application, the social security numbers of all enrollees and purged all persons ineligible due to issues of fraud or lack of lawful US residence. - Amends TCA Title 71.
Sponsors
Sen. Roy Herron [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 429 | |
2009-06-03 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0605) | |
2009-06-03 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2009-06-02 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 06/03/2009 | |
2009-06-02 | S. Reset on Cal. for 6/3/2009 | |
2009-05-29 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (2) cal. for 06/02/2009 | |
2009-05-20 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on S.GW,H&HR Comm. cal. for 05/20/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Action Def. in S.GW,H&HR Comm. to 5/20/2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on S.GW,H&HR Comm. cal. for 05/13/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Action Def. in S.GW,H&HR Comm. to 5/13/2009 | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on S.GW,H&HR Comm. cal. for 05/06/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Action Def. in S.GW,H&HR Comm. to 5/6/2009 | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on S.GW,H&HR Comm. cal. for 04/29/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S.GW,H&HR Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0220 (Crossfiled) 2009-06-23 - Pub. Ch. 429
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1787&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB1787.pdf |