TN SB1781 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 18 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the bureau of TennCare to provide prior notice to the chairs of the health committee of the house of representatives and the health and welfare committee of the senate before making pro rata reductions in payments from the nursing home assessment trust fund. - Amends TCA Title 68 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the bureau of TennCare to provide prior notice to the chairs of the health committee of the house of representatives and the health and welfare committee of the senate before making pro rata reductions in payments from the nursing home assessment trust fund. - Amends TCA Title 68 and Title 71.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-19HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-04-19HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-04-19SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-04-18SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2018-04-17HousePassed H., Ayes 89, Nays 2, PNV 0
2018-04-17HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA1013)
2018-04-17HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA1011)
2018-04-17HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2018-04-17SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2018-04-16SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-04-16SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2018-04-16SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0923)
2018-04-16SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0826)
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/16/2018
2018-04-12SenateSenate Reset on calendar 4/16/18
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/12/2018
2018-03-27SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0
2018-03-21SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/27/2018
2018-03-16SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-14SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2018-03-07SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/14/2018
2018-01-25SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2018-01-24SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-01-23SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1848 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-17 - Sponsor(s) Added.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback