TN SB1781 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 755
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 755
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the supreme court, upon its own motion, to assume jurisdiction over an application for interlocutory or extraordinary appeal that is filed with an intermediate state appellate court. - Amends TCA Title 16, Chapter 3.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the supreme court, upon its own motion, to assume jurisdiction over an application for interlocutory or extraordinary appeal that is filed with an intermediate state appellate court. - Amends TCA Title 16, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-22 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 755 | |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/28/2016 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2016 |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1734 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 755