TN SB1776 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Pub. Ch. 618
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Pub. Ch. 618
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds mental health hospitals licensed under title 33 to requirement for hospitals to report claims data to the commissioner of health. - Amends TCA Section 68-1-108.
Title
As enacted, adds mental health hospitals licensed under title 33 to requirement for hospitals to report claims data to the commissioner of health. - Amends TCA Section 68-1-108.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Pub. Ch. 618 | |
2018-04-04 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2018 | |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-03-20 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-03-12 | House | Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 2 |
2018-03-12 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-03-08 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/5/2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/28/2018 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1678 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 618