TN SB1775 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-12 - Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-12 - Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows counties to adopt and fund financial assistance programs, in particular last dollar scholarship programs, to assist county residents in attending community colleges and other postsecondary institutions; requires state higher education agencies to assist as appropriate in development of such programs. - Amends TCA Title 5 and Title 49.
Title
As introduced, allows counties to adopt and fund financial assistance programs, in particular last dollar scholarship programs, to assist county residents in attending community colleges and other postsecondary institutions; requires state higher education agencies to assist as appropriate in development of such programs. - Amends TCA Title 5 and Title 49.
Sponsors
Sen. Roy Herron [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-26 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-05 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-05 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-12 | Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-01-11 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 01/12/2010 | |
2009-06-03 | S. Reset on first regular cal. of 2010. | |
2009-06-02 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 06/03/2009 | |
2009-06-02 | S. Reset on Cal. for 6/3/2009 | |
2009-05-29 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (2) cal. for 06/02/2009 | |
2009-05-26 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2009-05-21 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/26/2009 | |
2009-05-05 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. FW&M Comm. | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 05/05/2009 | |
2009-04-28 | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 5/5/2009 | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 04/28/2009 | |
2009-04-14 | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 4/28/2009 | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 04/14/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2029 (Crossfiled) 2009-03-02 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.