TN SB1774 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows persons 65 years of age and older to be excused from jury service upon written request and sufficient proof of age. - Amends TCA Title 22.
Title
As introduced, allows persons 65 years of age and older to be excused from jury service upon written request and sufficient proof of age. - Amends TCA Title 22.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1808 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-04 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary