TN SB1768 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 953
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes the certification of registered nurse first assistants. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 7.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, authorizes the certification of registered nurse first assistants. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 7.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 2 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - S. H&W COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-03HousePub. Ch. 953
2014-06-03HouseEffective date(s) 05/19/2014; 01/01/2015
2014-05-19HouseSigned by Governor.
2014-05-08HouseTransmitted to Gov. for action.
2014-05-07HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2014-05-01HouseSigned by S. Speaker
2014-04-21HouseEnrolled and ready for signatures
2014-04-15HouseS. concurred in H. am. 2
2014-04-14HousePlaced on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 4/15/2014
2014-04-14HouseS. Reset on Cal. for 4/15/2014
2014-04-11HousePlaced on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 4/14/2014
2014-04-10HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 83, Nays 0
2014-04-10HouseH. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA1088)
2014-04-10HouseAm. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0749)
2014-04-10HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2014-03-20SenateRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2014-03-17SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2014-03-17SenatePassed S. as am., Ayes 30, Nays 0
2014-03-17SenateS. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0777)
2014-03-13SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/17/2014
2014-03-12SenateRec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2014-03-05SenatePlaced on S. H&W Comm. cal. for 3/12/2014
2014-01-23SenateP2C, ref. to S. H&W Comm.
2014-01-22SenateIntro., P1C.
2014-01-16SenateFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB1656 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 953

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback