TN SB1764 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-25 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-25 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, defines the term "central bank digital currency" and excludes the term from the definition of "money" for purposes of the Uniform Commercial Code. - Amends TCA Title 9; Title 45 and Title 47.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 9; Title 45 and Title 47, relative to digital currency.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Niceley [R] | Sen. Adam Lowe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |