TN SB1764 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires law enforcement officers to undergo training on the proper testing procedures for use in investigating cases of suspected driving under the influence as part of the annual in-service training required for certifications that occur on or after January 1, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 8 and Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 4.
Title
As introduced, requires law enforcement officers to undergo training on the proper testing procedures for use in investigating cases of suspected driving under the influence as part of the annual in-service training required for certifications that occur on or after January 1, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 8 and Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1804 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-03 - Held on desk